U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00058
  • Case Name: Moe v. Grinnell College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Errata]
  • September 22, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 07, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • September 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 17, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 17, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 17, 2021: [Statement]
  • August 17, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • August 16, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 11, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • August 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 11, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 30, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 30, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • July 26, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 26, 2021: [In Limine]
  • July 21, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 14, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 14, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • June 14, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 02, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 02, 2021: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 26, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 26, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 12, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • May 11, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 11, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • May 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 03, 2021: [Reply]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 21, 2021: [Leave]
  • April 21, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 13, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 12, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 09, 2021: [Seal]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 25, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 26, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 17, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 16, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 15, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [Compel]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Certify Objections of Law]
  • December 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 04, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • December 04, 2020: [Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 23, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 23, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 13, 2020: [Compel]
  • November 13, 2020: [Seal]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • October 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 02, 2020: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • October 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Certify Questions of Law]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 04, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 24, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • April 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 26, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 20, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 19, 2020: [Leave]
  • February 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.