U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Chapman et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
  • June 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • May 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 21, 2020: [Leave]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • February 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 20, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • February 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.