U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00019
  • Case Name: Hippler v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • February 20, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • February 20, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.