U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00021
  • Case Name: Krug et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.