U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Greek House Chefs, Inc. v. Upper Crust Food Service, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 17, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2022: [Reopen Case]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • July 21, 2020: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • February 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.