U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00061
  • Case Name: Deere Credit, Inc. v. PXI, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 15, 2021: [Costs Taxed]
  • April 05, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Filing Bankruptcy]
  • March 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Statement]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • July 24, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Bankruptcy]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 03, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 11, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 11, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • February 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.