U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Frandsen v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • August 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 25, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • August 31, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • August 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order]
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 01, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • February 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.