U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Nelson v. Polk County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Letter]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • March 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2020: [Mail Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 24, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.