U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Hicks vs McKinney
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 13, 2022: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Brief /Other]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Brief /Other]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 20, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 31, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 10, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 03, 2020: [Reconsideration]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 16, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 13, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • April 29, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 29, 2020: [Response to Habeas Petition]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Waiver]
  • February 25, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 25, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.