U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Wenger v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 06, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.