U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00074
  • Case Name: Six v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 07, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 02, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 05, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for RR]
  • March 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • February 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.