U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00073
  • Case Name: Ames Municipal Electric System v. Iowa Utilities Board et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 22, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 15, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 08, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Strike]
  • April 20, 2020: [Strike]
  • April 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Joinder]
  • March 27, 2020: [Remand]
  • March 26, 2020: [Intervene]
  • March 23, 2020: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • March 20, 2020: [Intervene]
  • March 17, 2020: [Intervene]
  • March 16, 2020: [Intervene]
  • March 13, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice of Removal By USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.