U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Peterson-Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • March 11, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 11, 2021: [In Limine]
  • March 09, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Leave]
  • March 09, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 09, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • March 09, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 09, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 09, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 09, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • March 08, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • March 04, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 04, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 18, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 16, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 15, 2021: [Order]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 11, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 08, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2020: [Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 20, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • November 12, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 11, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 06, 2020: [Strike]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 06, 2020: [Order]
  • May 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 30, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 30, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.