U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Surajbally v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.