U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00078
  • Case Name: Sullivan v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 06, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • May 17, 2021: [Closing Documents]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Seal]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Errata]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 01, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 25, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 14, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 03, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 02, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.