U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Horton v. The Iowa Department of Corrections
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 13, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 05, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.