U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Clayton v. Rhoades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • March 12, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 05, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.