U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Rosales v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 21, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • March 11, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • October 19, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 18, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 05, 2020: [Stay]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 07, 2020: [Summons Issued]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 08, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.