U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Gillespie et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Stay]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • November 09, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
  • November 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 09, 2020: [Stay]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 01, 2020: [Errata]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Leave]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order]
  • March 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2020: [Status Report]
  • March 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 18, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 09, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.