U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Tidriri v. The Board of Regents et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • September 20, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Entry of Default]
  • September 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 24, 2020: [Default Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 25, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 12, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 11, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 22, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 17, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • July 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 09, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 17, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • June 11, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Summons Issued]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.