U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00026
  • Case Name: Hotovec v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 22, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 22, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.