U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04012
  • Case Name: Clinkenbeard v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Case Ready for Decision]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Unseal Document]
  • March 10, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.