U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Potter v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • January 04, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • October 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 01, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 01, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.