U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Droll v. City of Keota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 02, 2022: [Stipulation]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Staying Case]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 16, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • November 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 15, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • November 14, 2021: [Errata]
  • November 10, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Transcript]
  • November 03, 2021: [Seal]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [In Limine]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • October 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Reply]
  • September 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • August 27, 2021: [Consolidate Cases]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • July 19, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Leave]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Statement]
  • June 29, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Status Report]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 14, 2020: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order]
  • August 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 03, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 02, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 18, 2020: [Statement]
  • March 18, 2020: [TRO]
  • March 18, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 18, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 17, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 13, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Certificate]
  • March 12, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 10, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • March 10, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.