U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04007
  • Case Name: Guntert & Zimmerman Construction Division, Inc v. Gomaco Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Seal]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.