U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Lovely v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • February 10, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 29, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 12, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.