U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00090
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Seven (7) Firearms and Ammunition seized from 566 K Avenue, Boone, Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 03, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Default Judgment]
  • August 14, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 13, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • June 19, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2020: [Writ Returned]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • March 13, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • March 11, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.