U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Adams v. Weitzell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Mail Returned]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.