U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00011
  • Case Name: Silvestri v. F&M Capital, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 07, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.