U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Principal Life Insurance Company v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Authorizing Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 05, 2022: [Interpleader Disbursement (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Settlement]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 04, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 03, 2022: [Release of Funds]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Statement]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Statement]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 13, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 11, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Stay]
  • January 21, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • January 04, 2021: [Disbursement of Funds]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Disbursement of Funds]
  • October 07, 2020: [Partial Judgment]
  • October 01, 2020: [DOF/CRIS Deposit]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 21, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • May 07, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • May 07, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 03, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 17, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • March 17, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 16, 2020: [Seal]
  • March 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.