U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Smith v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • June 05, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2020: [Brief /Other]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 27, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 16, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 16, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.