U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Betts v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 14, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 02, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Leave]
  • June 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 12, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 31, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 17, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.