U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Conaway v. Brightstar CRDM, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • March 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • March 15, 2021: [Proposed Pretrial Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • March 12, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 12, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2021: [Motion in Limine]
  • March 11, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 11, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 26, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • February 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 24, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
  • February 23, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 19, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 12, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
  • February 04, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 07, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • December 04, 2020: [Leave]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 18, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • November 04, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 02, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Seal]
  • October 26, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • October 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2020: [Leave]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 23, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • September 22, 2020: [Status Report]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 13, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 10, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 05, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 04, 2020: [Leave to File]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Leave]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 17, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.