U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00023
  • Case Name: United States of America et al v. StratComm, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Status Report]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2021
  • December 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 23, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 23, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • June 28, 2021: [Status Report]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Status Report]
  • April 08, 2020: [Stay]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Case Stayed]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 27, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 19, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.