U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Bland v. Swift Pork Company, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 03, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 18, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Protective Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 24, 2020: [Order]
  • April 24, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 24, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 23, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 19, 2020: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.