U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00102
  • Case Name: S. et al v. Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 21, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 23, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • March 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 20, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 20, 2020: [Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.