U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00104
  • Case Name: Cook v. Gibbs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 08, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 14, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 03, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 06, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Compel]
  • June 02, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 01, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 20, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 23, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.