U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Roe v. Grinnell College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 10, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 07, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 16, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 09, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • June 05, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 01, 2020: [Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 20, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 08, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 07, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 23, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Leave]
  • March 23, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.