U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00109
  • Case Name: Mitchell et al v. Des Moines Independent Community School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 26, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Report]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 22, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2020: [Status Report]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [Protective Order]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 04, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
  • May 04, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • May 04, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 14, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • April 13, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • April 13, 2020: [Leave]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 30, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • March 24, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.