U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00113
  • Case Name: Roberson v. Council Bluffs Police Officers
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 08, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • May 04, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • April 23, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2020: [Brief /Other]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.