U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Foor v. Scott County Deputies et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 30, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • March 26, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.