U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Segovia v. Riverwoods Terrace, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 02, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • June 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 17, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 11, 2021: [LR 83E Exhibits]
  • June 10, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 03, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 08, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 12, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.