U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00110
  • Case Name: Lara v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 28, 2021: [Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2021: [Stay]
  • June 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 14, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Stay]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 24, 2020: [Order]
  • September 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 24, 2020: [Closing Documents]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2020
  • June 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 25, 2020: [Stay]
  • June 23, 2020: [Stay]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • March 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 25, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 25, 2020: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.