U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Moller v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 20, 2020: [Leave to File]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Substitute Party]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Substitute Party]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 21, 2020: [Leave]
  • May 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 18, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 05, 2020: [Errata]
  • May 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 04, 2020: [Stay]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2020: [Errata]
  • April 20, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.