U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02021
  • Case Name: Scott v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Stay]
  • May 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.