U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00417
  • Case Name: C.P.X. et al v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice - Other]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Sealed Document]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 17, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice - Other]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 13, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Consent]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 06, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Statement]
  • February 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2021: [Status Report]
  • February 03, 2021: [Documents Sent]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 21, 2021: [Statement]
  • January 20, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 06, 2020: [Statement]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
  • November 02, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Declaration]
  • May 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 11, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 04, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 10, 2020: [Declaration]
  • April 10, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.