U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Richards v. Polk County District Court
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • April 07, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • April 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 31, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 31, 2020: [Leave]
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.