U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00087
  • Case Name: Emory Dry Ice, Inc. et al v. Stewart et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice - Other]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2021: [Declaration]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • March 10, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 09, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Declaration]
  • March 05, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order]
  • February 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • February 19, 2021: [Compel]
  • February 19, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • February 11, 2021: [Notice - Other]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 06, 2020: [Certificate]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 11, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 10, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • June 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 01, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 01, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.