U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00402
  • Case Name: Miller et al v. Ames Iowa, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • August 24, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 24, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Report]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 03, 2020: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2020: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.