U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00005
  • Case Name: Thompson et al v. Country Preferred Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • June 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2020: [Order]
  • April 03, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.